Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 12:04:42 (UTC).

Jose Gonzalez et al. vs Jovita D Rodriguez et al.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 Jose Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jovita D Rodriguez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0723

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gonzalez, Jose

Gonzalez, Sandra

Defendants

Rodriguez, Jovita D

Rodriguez, Juan J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amendola, Robert A

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jose Gonzalez, Sandra Gonzalez, Jovita D Rodriguez, Juan J Rodriguez Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

10/02/2017: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/24/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jovita D Rodriguez served on 07/05/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan J Rodriguez served on 07/07/2017 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gonzalez, Sandra; Gonzalez, Jose. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Jose; Gonzalez, Sandra. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gonzalez, Jose; Gonzalez, Sandra. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

01/25/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

01/25/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jose Gonzalez, Sandra Gonzalez, Jovita D Rodriguez, Juan J Rodriguez Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Gonzalez, Sandra; Gonzalez, Jose. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/24/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 24, 2017. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/22/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jovita D Rodriguez served on 07/05/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan J Rodriguez served on 07/07/2017 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Gonzalez, Sandra; Gonzalez, Jose. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Attorney, Robert A Amendola, retained for Jose Gonzalez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/24/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Payment received by Jose Gonzalez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 136929. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Attorney, Robert A Amendola, retained for Sandra Gonzalez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Jose; Gonzalez, Sandra. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gonzalez, Jose; Gonzalez, Sandra. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A Amendola