Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 11:33:52 (UTC).

Jose Carrillo vs Jose Sandoval

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 Jose Carrillo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Sandoval. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0449

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrillo, Jose

Defendant

Sandoval, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goldberg, Michael

Defendant Attorney

Polito, Dominic Martin

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

05/03/2018: Notice of Hearing

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/20/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/21/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sandoval, Jose. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Sandoval, Jose. (Antonio Ayala, erroneously sued & served as JOSE SANDOVAL) Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Sandoval, Jose. (Antonio Ayala, erroneously sued & served as JOSE SANDOVAL) Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint - Motor Vehicle - Property Damage; Personal Injury - Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

01/17/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 09/14/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment, set for 06/18/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 05/14/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on November 20, 2017. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/20/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/20/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • Payment received by Jose Sandoval in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 159600. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Payment received by Jose Sandoval in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 159600. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/21/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Attorney, Michael Goldberg, retained for Jose Carrillo . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Payment received by Jose Carrillo in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 134634. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint - Motor Vehicle - Property Damage; Personal Injury - Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carrillo, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDBERG, MICHAEL