This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 09:11:59 (UTC).

Jose Alaniz vs Weston Tucker

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Jose Alaniz filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Weston Tucker. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mulvihill, Michael and Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2303

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mulvihill, Michael

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alaniz, Jose

Defendant

Tucker, Weston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Rafael

Defendant Attorney

De Simone, Gerry

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/11/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tucker, Weston. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Tucker, Weston. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Weston Tucker served on 11/29/2019 by Personal Service. $60.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Returned Check for Nonpayment

Payment for 168-Complaint receipt # 474360 in the amount of $370.00 voided due to Non-Sufficient Funds. Owes $370.00 plus $50.00 nsf charge = $420.00 due by 10/17/19 Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Returned Check for Nonpayment

09/26/2019: Notice of Returned Check for Nonpayment

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alaniz, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Alaniz, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Jose Alaniz (Plaintiff); Participant: Weston Tucker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketJayne Lee Assigned. BATCH Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $60.00, receipt number 554618. from 02/26/20 - Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAssessed $150.00 Civil Costs on Defendant, Tucker, Weston Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/11/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/11/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Michael Mulvihill; Participant: Jose Alaniz (Plaintiff); Participant: Weston Tucker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 13, 2020. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Tucker, Weston. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Tucker, Weston. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketAssessed $370.00 Civil Costs on Plaintiff, Alaniz, Jose Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketAssessed $50.00 Civil Costs on Plaintiff, Alaniz, Jose Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/13/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alaniz, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Alaniz, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Jose Alaniz in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 474360. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Jose Alaniz . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.