Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 03:53:24 (UTC).

Jorge Esquivel Duarte vs Carlos Avalos et al.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Jorge Esquivel Duarte filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Carlos Avalos. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4406

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duarte, Jorge Esquivel

Defendants

Aguilera, Juan M

Cal-West Pool Inc., a California Corporation

Avalos, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Szkopek, Agnes M

Defendant Attorney

Swingle, Bradley J

 

Court Documents

request for dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. (Duplicate) Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Carlos Avalos served on 06/12/2020 by Substituted Service. $195.90. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan M Aguilera served on 06/06/2020 by Personal Service. $177.70. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Stipulation and Order

Order to Allow the Filing of the Second Amended Complaint entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 02/24/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Avalos, Carlos. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 10/30/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Avalos, Carlos. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

answer

Answer To First Amended Complaint filed by Avalos, Carlos. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Juan M Aguilera, Cal-West Pool Inc., a California Corporation. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Cal-West Pool Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Carlos Avalos (Defendant); Participant: Jorge Esquivel Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Juan M Aguilera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Allow the Filing of the Second Amended Complaint entered and filed. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Cal-West Pool Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Carlos Avalos (Defendant); Participant: Jorge Esquivel Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Juan M Aguilera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/24/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jorge Duarte in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 624376. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 02/24/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on February 24, 2021. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Avalos, Carlos. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Cal-West Pool Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Carlos Avalos (Defendant); Participant: Jorge Esquivel Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Juan M Aguilera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Juan M Aguilera served on 06/06/2020 by Personal Service. $177.70. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. (Duplicate) Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/30/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Agnes M Szkopek, retained for Jorge Esquivel Duarte . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Duarte, Jorge Esquivel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Jorge Duarte in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 562052. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swingle, Bradley J