This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:52 (UTC).

Jonathan Almaraz vs Jerrold Westbrooks

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Jonathan Almaraz filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jerrold Westbrooks. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1894

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Almaraz, Jonathan

Defendant

Westbrooks, Jerrold

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 08/29/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Almaraz, Jonathan. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

sc100 ----RESET

Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 2500.00 and Costs $ 50.00 ., set for 05/25/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 08/29/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reset - Parties Motion Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 2500.00 and Costs $ 50.00 ., set for 05/25/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/28/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Principal 2500.00, Costs 50.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $3.50, receipt number 34490. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Almaraz, Jonathan. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 34486. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less