This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 01:32:13 (UTC).

John Pinheiro vs Thomas Hussey et al.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2015 John Pinheiro filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Thomas Hussey. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0425

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pinheiro, John

Defendants

Hussey, Michelle

Hussey, Thomas

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Pinheiro, John. Post and Mail, date of service 11/16/2015,fees 55.00 Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for John Pinheiro against Thomas Hussey, Michelle Hussey in the amount of $1306.76 Holdover damages, $1400.00 Past-due rent, $250.00 Attorney fees, $425.00 Costs for a total judgment amount of $3381.76. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Pinheiro, John. Not Entered Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for John Pinheiro against Thomas Hussey, Michelle Hussey filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Thomas Hussey served on 11/16/2015. Type of Service Post & Mail. $ 55.00. Declaration of Mailing attached. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution as to Michelle Hussey and Thomas Hussey returned and filed. Status: Returned With Full Satisfaction. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Thomas Hussey and Michelle Hussey on 10/20/2016 to Alameda County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketPayment received by Bruce Doerksen in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 112410. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketAttorney Anthony Drew Rowe removed from case. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for John Pinheiro against Thomas Hussey, Michelle Hussey in the amount of $1306.76 Holdover damages, $1400.00 Past-due rent, $250.00 Attorney fees, $425.00 Costs for a total judgment amount of $3381.76. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Pinheiro, John. Not Entered Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Thomas Hussey and Michelle Hussey returned Satisfied as to possession only. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 6481. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 5662. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Pinheiro, John. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for John Pinheiro . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketOrder Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less