Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/07/2018 at 02:36:30 (UTC).

John Martin Perez vs. City of Stockton

Case Summary

On 06/04/2010 John Martin Perez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Stockton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9269

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Miscellaneous Participant,

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Perez, John Martin

City Of Stockton

Miscellaneous Participant 2,

Stockton Police Department

Miscellaneous Participant 101

Miscellaneous Participant 100

Ulring, Blair

Serna, Michael Thomas

Rincon, Emiliano

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Tentative Rulings

07/14/2015: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

06/25/2015: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

06/23/2015: Tentative Rulings

Payment Receipt

06/01/2012: Payment Receipt

Tentative Rulings

03/25/2011: Tentative Rulings

Tentative Rulings

03/25/2011: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

12/23/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

06/04/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement or, in the alternative, for summary Adjudiction of issues filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Separate Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

motion of summary judgment

Defenant Chief Blair Ulring's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Payment Receipt

07/23/2015: Payment Receipt

Tentative Rulings

03/27/2015: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

09/18/2013: Minute Order

Notice Reassignment Judicial San Joaquin

08/27/2013: Notice Reassignment Judicial San Joaquin

Payment Receipt

06/14/2012: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

10/14/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Tentative Rulings

12/21/2010: Tentative Rulings

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Miscellaneous Participant 5, Miscellaneous Participant 1, Miscellaneous Participant 6, Miscellaneous Participant 2, Miscellaneous Participant 2, Miscellaneous Participant 1, John Martin Perez, Miscellaneous Participant 4, Blair Ulring. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Chief Blair Ulring filed by Perez, John Martin. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adj. , set for 05/12/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Defenant Chief Blair Ulring's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Defenant Chief Blair Ulring's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement or, in the alternative, for summary Adjudiction of issues filed by Ulring, Blair. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
506 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2010
  • Cause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 11/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Perez, John Martin on 06/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, John Martin on 06/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Complaint filed by Perez, John Martin on 06/04/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less