Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 20:53:29 (UTC).

John Luster et al. vs Zaman Akhtar et al.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 John Luster filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Zaman Akhtar. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4621

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Luster, Leon

Luster, John

Luster, Junan

Luster, Edra

Luster, Charles

Luster, Sylvester

Jackson, Eugene Teel

Luster, Clyde

Luster II, Anne

Luster, Jr, Roy D

Defendants

Rausain, Bibi

Akhtar, Zaman

Not Classified By Court

Mordaunt, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolan, Christopher B

Defendant Attorney

Borges, Guy D.

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion by Defendant's to Compel Plaintiffs John Luster, Clyde Luster, Leon Luster, Charles Luster, Junan Luster, Anne Luster II, Roy D. Luster Jr., Edra Luster, and Sylvester Luster Verified Further Responses to Special Interrogatories - Set One and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $1110.00 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Andrew C. Oberst in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set Two and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, from Plaintiff Eugene Jackson Submitted to Discovery Referee Submission Date: June 13, 2019 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set Two and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, from Plaintiff Eugene Jackson Submitted to Discovery Referee Submission Date: June 13, 2019 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Order Continuing Settlement Conference and Trial filed by Zaman Akhtar, Bibi Rausain. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Mordaunt, Michael. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Reply

Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Jackson, Eugene Teel. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Deft's of Motion to Compel Pltfs' further verified further responses to special interrogatories- set one and request monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,110.00 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Second Amended Motion

Defendants' Second Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Plaintiff Eugene Teel Jackson's Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents-Set One and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount $1,110.00 filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Motion (No Fee); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion to Compel

Defendants' Notice of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, From Plaintiff Eugene Jackson Submitted to Discovery Referee Submission Date: June 13, 2019 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation

Stipulation to Vacate the Trial Dates and Set the Matter for an Alternative Trial Date filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Further Response, Motion to Compel Further Response held on 03/13/2019 09:00 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration in support of Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, set One, to Plaintiff Eugene Tell Jackson filed by Akhtar, Zaman. Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion to Compel

Deft's Notice of Motion to Compel Pltfs' further verified further responses to special interrogatories- set one and request monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,110.00 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion to Compel

Defendant's notice of Motion to Compel Pltf Eugene Teel Jackson's further responses to request for production of documents-set one and request for monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,110.00 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer To Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Matthew D. Gramly in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Re: Unduly Burdensome, Repetitive and Oppressive Discovery Practices and Requests Propounded by Defendants filed by Luster, John. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Re: Unduly Burdensome, Repetitive and Oppressive Discovery Practices and Requests Propounded by Defendants filed by Luster, John. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Protective Order Re: Unduly Burdensome, Repetitive and Oppressive Discovery Practices and Requests Propounded by Defendants filed by Luster, John. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 07/25/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on July 25, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion by Defendant to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set Two and Request for Production of Documents Set One, from Plaintiff Eugene Jackson filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion by Defendant's to Compel Plaintiffs John Luster, Clyde Luster, Leon Luster, Charles Luster, Junan Luster, Anne Luster II, Roy D. Luster Jr., Edra Luster, and Sylvester Luster Verified Further Responses to Special Interrogatories - Set One and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $1110.00 filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion by Defendant to Compel Plaintiffs John Luster, Clyde Luster, Leon Luster, Charles Luster, Junan Luster, Anne Luster II, Roy D. Luster Jr. Edra Luster, and Sylvester Luster's Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories, SET ONE Request for Production of Documents, SET ONE, and Special Interrogatories -SET TWO filed by Rausain, Bibi; Akhtar, Zaman. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion by Defendant's to Compel Plaintiff Eugene Teel Jackson's Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents - Set One and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $1110.00 filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Akhtar, Zaman; Rausain, Bibi. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Attorney, Christopher B Dolan, retained for Roy D Luster, Jr . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Attorney, Christopher B Dolan, retained for John Luster . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Luster II, Anne; Luster, Junan; Luster, Edra; Luster, Jr, Roy D; Luster, Sylvester; Luster, John; Jackson, Eugene Teel; Luster, Clyde; Luster, Leon; Luster, Charles. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Attorney, Christopher B Dolan, retained for Anne Luster II . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Attorney, Christopher B Dolan, retained for Sylvester Luster . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Attorney, Christopher B Dolan, retained for Eugene Teel Jackson . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Payment received by John Luster in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 285714. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORGES, GUY D.