This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 19:19:20 (UTC).

John Hatges vs. Corporate Benefit Services Inc

Case Summary

On 07/27/2009 John Hatges filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Corporate Benefit Services Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3329

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hatges, Julie

Hatges, John

Defendants

Corporate Benefit Services Inc

Bud'S Concrete

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

05/03/2007: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

07/27/2009: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Notice of Nomination of Arbitrators

01/28/2010: Notice of Nomination of Arbitrators

Minute Order

12/28/2009: Minute Order

Notice to Filing Party

05/03/2007: Notice to Filing Party

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail

09/02/2009: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator San Joaquin

03/12/2010: Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator San Joaquin

Notice of Recission of Arbitrator

05/07/2010: Notice of Recission of Arbitrator

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator San Joaquin

05/07/2010: Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator San Joaquin

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketCase status updated to Post Judgment effective 11/09/2010 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketCase note created on 11/05/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Docketlocation changed from Other Court Location,Stockton,Other to Other Court Location,Tracy,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketStatus of Julie Hatges updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketStatus of Bud's Concrete updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketStatus of John Hatges updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketCase note created on 09/15/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketAppointment of Arbitrator - Sanders, David M. ended. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketAppointment of Arbitrator - Papas, Chris Wm ended. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketAppointment of Arbitrator - Kozina, Vladimir F ended. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketPayment received for 28 - Complaint or other 1st paper >$10K<=$25K in the amount of 325.00 on 07/27/2009, transaction number 370892 and receipt number 81608. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hatges, John; Hatges, Julie on 07/27/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bud's Concrete, Inc., a corporation is a litigant