Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 11:07:44 (UTC).

John D. Denigres Nunes vs Michael Barakatt

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 John D Denigres Nunes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michael Barakatt. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0149

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John D. Denigres and Aleisa M. Nunes,

Denigres, John D

Nunes, Aleisa M

Defendant

Barakatt, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roxson, Randy Dale

Defendant Attorney

Rendler, Devereaux

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 11/14/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/11/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Nunes, Aleisa M; Denigres, John D. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nunes, Aleisa M; Denigres, John D. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Barakatt, Michael. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

demand for jury

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Barakatt, Michael. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to Complaint - First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Barakatt, Michael. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Barakatt served on 04/03/2017 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nunes, John D. Denigres. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint for Motor Vehicle Personal Injury filed by Nunes, John D. Denigres. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment, set for 09/10/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 08/27/2018 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on November 14, 2017. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 11/14/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 11/14/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 11, 2017. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/11/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Nunes, Aleisa M; Denigres, John D. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Nunes, Aleisa M; Denigres, John D. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Attorney, Devereaux Rendler, retained for Michael Barakatt . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Barakatt, Michael. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Barakatt served on 04/03/2017 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/11/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Attorney, Randy Dale Roxson, retained for John D. Denigres Nunes . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Payment received by John Nunes in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 131698. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nunes, John D. Denigres. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Motor Vehicle Personal Injury filed by Nunes, John D. Denigres. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENDLER, DEVEREAUX