This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:39:04 (UTC).

Joaquin Yepez vs Clara Ordaz Ramirez

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Joaquin Yepez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Clara Ordaz Ramirez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0897

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yepez, Joaquin

Respondent

Ramirez, Clara Ordaz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Marital Status terminated 3/1/17. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Yepez, Joaquin. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Yepez, Joaquin. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Yepez, Joaquin. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Request for Default against Clara Ordaz Ramirez Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Proof of Personal Service filed by Yepez, Joaquin. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34265. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Yepez, Joaquin. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Joaquin Yepez . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less