This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/01/2023 at 05:16:42 (UTC).

Joaquin Vasquez vs Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Joaquin Vasquez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2333

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vasquez, Joaquin

Defendant

Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friedman, Todd M.

Defendant Attorney

De Leon, Lara C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vasquez, Joaquin.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vasquez, Joaquin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. served on 01/06/2023 by Personal Service. $80.00.

Answer

Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint(amount over $25,000) filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc..

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Joaquin Vasquez (Plaintiff); Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Lara C De Leon, retained for Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint(amount over $25,000) filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Ryder Integrated Logistics in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 809307.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. served on 01/06/2023 by Personal Service. $80.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/28/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vasquez, Joaquin.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vasquez, Joaquin.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Joaquin Vasquez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 800395.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Todd M. Friedman, retained for Joaquin Vasquez .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less