This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/08/2023 at 02:32:55 (UTC).

Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust vs Rafael De Los Santos

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Jick G Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Rafael De Los Santos. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rasmussen, Michael J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0138

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rasmussen, Michael J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust

Defendant

De Los Santos, Rafael

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed.

UD101 Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations - Unlawful Detainer

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.

Order to Allow Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Rafael De Los Santos, All Occupants Not Entered

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of as to All Occupants Unserved on . $55.00. Declaration of mailing was not attached

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Summons returned Unserved as to Rafael De Los Santos. Costs $55.00 Declaration of mailing was not attached.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Rafael De Los Santos, All Occupants Not Entered

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Rafael De Los Santos, All Occupants Entered

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Rafael De Los Santos served on 12/12/2022 by Post & Mail. $55.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service of as to All Occupants served on 12/12/2022. $55.00.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust against Rafael De Los Santos filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. .

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Rafael De Los Santos on 01/10/2023 to San Joaquin County.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Trustee Jick G. Leong in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 802539.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust against Rafael De Los Santos filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. .; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service of as to All Occupants served on 12/12/2022. $55.00.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service of Summons as to Rafael De Los Santos served on 12/12/2022 by Post & Mail. $55.00.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Rafael De Los Santos, All Occupants Entered; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of as to All Occupants Unserved on . $55.00. Declaration of mailing was not attached; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Trustee Jick G. Leong in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 793372.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Anthony Rowe in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 785382.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust .; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Jick G. Leong, Trustee of the Leong Family Trust.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less