This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/01/2023 at 03:03:57 (UTC).

Jesus Toledo vs Martin Wesley et al.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Jesus Toledo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martin Wesley. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0056

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Toledo, Jesus

Defendants

Martin Wesley Family Vineyards, a business entity form unknown

Tamayooo, Jeff

Wesley Family Vineyards LLC

Wesley, Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khan, Saveel

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Toledo, Jesus.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toledo, Jesus.

Answer

Answer filed by Martin Wesley Family Vineyards, a business entity form unknown; Wesley Family Vineyards LLC; Wesley, Martin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Martin Wesley served on 11/30/2022 by Substituted Service. $140.00.

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of service of Summons & Complaint as to Martin Wesley served on 11/30/2022 by Substituted Service. $140.00. filed by Toledo, Jesus. DUPLICATE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Jeff Tamayooo (Defendant); Jesus Toledo (Plaintiff); Martin Wesley (Defendant); Martin Wesley Family Vineyards, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Wesley Family Vineyards LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service of Summons & Complaint as to Martin Wesley served on 11/30/2022 by Substituted Service. $140.00. filed by Toledo, Jesus. DUPLICATE.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Martin Wesley served on 11/30/2022 by Substituted Service. $140.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Martin Wesley Family Vineyards, a business entity form unknown; Wesley Family Vineyards LLC; Wesley, Martin.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Wesley Family Vineyards LLC in the amount of $1305.00. Receipt number 795609.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/02/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Toledo, Jesus.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toledo, Jesus.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Jesus Toledo in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 784445.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Saveel Khan, retained for Jesus Toledo .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less