This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 07:55:58 (UTC).

Jesus M. Estrada vs Maria Secundina Vasquez Oliva

Case Summary

On 01/28/2016 Jesus M Estrada filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Maria Secundina Vasquez Oliva. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0413

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Estrada, Jesus M.

Respondent

Oliva, Maria Secundina Vasquez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Maria Secundina Vasquez Oliva filed. Served on 02/06/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Estrada, Jesus M.. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Estrada, Jesus M.. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Estrada, Jesus M.. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketRequest for Default against Maria Secundina Vasquez Oliva Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Pro Per, retained for Jesus M. Estrada . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Jesus M. Estrada filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Estrada, Jesus M.. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Estrada, Jesus M.. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Estrada, Jesus M.. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less