This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 03:35:49 (UTC).

Jesse Scott vs Christina Micciche et al.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Jesse Scott filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Christina Micciche. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1483

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott, Jesse

Defendants

Equity Management, Inc.

Garcia, Justin

Golden Opportunity Investments, LP.

Micciche, Christina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Partiyeli, Jacob O

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Notice to Filing Party

12/20/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Scott, Jesse.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scott, Jesse.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP. served on 01/28/2022 by Personal Service. $55.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 01/31/2022 by Personal Service. $50.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Justin Garcia served on 01/31/2022 by Personal Service. $50.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Christina Micciche served on 01/31/2022 by Personal Service. $50.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Christina Micciche (Defendant); Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP. (Defendant); Jesse Scott (Plaintiff); Justin Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Christina Micciche served on 01/31/2022 by Personal Service. $50.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Justin Garcia served on 01/31/2022 by Personal Service. $50.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 01/31/2022 by Personal Service. $50.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP. served on 01/28/2022 by Personal Service. $55.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scott, Jesse.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/20/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Scott, Jesse.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jesse Scott in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 704757.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Jesse Scott .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Oppurtunity Investments LP is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O