Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 01:45:12 (UTC).

Jerry M. Juan et al. vs Woodside 05N, LP

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Jerry M Juan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Woodside 05N, LP. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3194

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Springs, Candelaria

Juan, Maria Leah G.

Nails, Debbie

Wells, Linda G.

Juan, Jerry M.

Reyes, Santiago

Reyes, Tiffany

Wanzala-Silva, Winnifred L.

Wallace, Edwina

Silva, Joe

Defendants

WOODSIDE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation

WOODSIDE 05N, LP, a California limited partnership

Cross Defendants

*Marble Palace, Inc. dba Cultured Marble Palace

*Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc.

*West-Cal Concrete, Inc.

*Fenceworks, Inc.

*Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc.

*RCI Electric, Inc., dba Rayco Electric

*S. Hafoka Electric

*BMC West Corporation

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LoCoco, Antonina C.

Defendant Attorney

Smith, Daniel J.

Other Attorneys

Milionis, George K.

Walsh, Paul Bradley

Dalmore, Jean A

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Appoint Special Master & Order thereon entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Cross-Complaint for 1)Comparative Negligence 2) Express Contractual Indemnity 3) Equitable Indemnity 4) Contribution 5)Breach of Express Warranty 6) Breach of Implied Warranty 7) Breach of Contract 8) Declaratory Relief-Duty to Defend 9) Declaratory Relief-Indemnity 10)Professional Negligence 11) Strict liability filed by *WOODSIDE 05N, L.P.. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM110 Summons - Cross Complaint

Cross- Complaint Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

08/19/2019: Notice to Filing Party

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by WOODSIDE 05N, LP, a California limited partnership. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to WOODSIDE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to WOODSIDE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation served on 04/12/2019 by Personal Service. $45.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wallace, Edwina; Reyes, Santiago; Reyes, Tiffany; Juan, Jerry M.; Juan, Maria Leah G.; Nails, Debbie; Springs, Candelaria; Wanzala-Silva, Winnifred L.; Wells, Linda G.; Silva, Joe. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Petersen-dean, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint-----First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by *Petersen-Dean, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment 1 to Plaintiffs' Complaint and/or Operative Complaint filed by Juan, Jerry M.. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Case Management Order #1

Case Management Order No. One filed by Sarah F Burke. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/10/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by WOODSIDE 05N, LP, a California limited partnership. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Silva, Joe, et al. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Plaintiffs entered as to Santiago Reyes, Tiffany Reyes. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Wallace, Edwina; Reyes, Santiago; Reyes, Tiffany; Juan, Jerry M.; Juan, Maria Leah G.; Nails, Debbie; Springs, Candelaria; Wanzala-Silva, Winnifred L.; Wells, Linda G.; Silva, Joe. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: *Alcal Arcade Contracting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *American Liberty Roofing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Azevedo Painting (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *BF Glass, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *BMC West Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *BZ Plumbing Company, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Beutler Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Blue Mountain Air, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Carmichael Door, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Custom Grading, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Energetic Painting and Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Excel Cabinets, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Fence America, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Fenceworks, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Framecon, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Gold Star Insulation, L.P. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Ike's Landscape, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Kenyon Plastering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Kiwi Stair, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Marble Palace, Inc. dba Cultured Marble Palace (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Matts Roofing, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Mid Valley Plastering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Monschein Industries, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Nail It Construction, dba Titan Framing (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Petersen-Dean, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *RCI Electric, Inc., dba Rayco Electric (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *S. Hafoka Electric (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Security by Design (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Sunpower Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *TDH Construction, Inc., dba Foothill Painting & Drywall (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Tanner Masonry (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *WOODSIDE 05N, L.P. (Cross-Complainant); Participant: *Warda Glass, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Western Insulation, LP, dba Western Insulation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Candelaria Springs (Plaintiff); Participant: Debbie Nails (Plaintiff); Participant: Doe 1 Woodside Preton Meadows, Inc (Defendant); Participant: Edwina Wallace (Plaintiff); Participant: Jerry M. Juan (Plaintiff); Participant: Joe Silva (Plaintiff); Participant: Linda G. Wells (Plaintiff); Participant: Maria Leah G. Juan (Plaintiff); Participant: Santiago Reyes (Plaintiff); Participant: Sarah F Burke (Special Master); Participant: Tiffany Reyes (Plaintiff); Participant: Tsz Ho (Plaintiff); Participant: WOODSIDE 05N, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); Participant: WOODSIDE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Participant: Winnifred L. Wanzala-Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order No. 2 Re: Pre-Trial Discovery signed by Judge Ross on 11/17/2020 filed by Sarah F Burke. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplex Case Fee (Per Defendant) filed by *BMC West Corporation. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (Per Defendant); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Defendant BMC West Corporation's Answer to the Cross-Complaint of Woodside 05N, LP filed by *BMC West Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received by *BMC West Corporation in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 595755. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received by *BMC West Corporation in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 595755. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: *Alcal Arcade Contracting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *American Liberty Roofing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Azevedo Painting (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *BF Glass, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *BMC West Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *BZ Plumbing Company, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Beutler Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Blue Mountain Air, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Carmichael Door, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Custom Grading, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Energetic Painting and Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Excel Cabinets, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Fence America, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Fenceworks, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Framecon, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Gold Star Insulation, L.P. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Ike's Landscape, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Kenyon Plastering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Kiwi Stair, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Marble Palace, Inc. dba Cultured Marble Palace (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Matts Roofing, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Mid Valley Plastering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Monschein Industries, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Nail It Construction, dba Titan Framing (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Petersen-Dean, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *RCI Electric, Inc., dba Rayco Electric (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *S. Hafoka Electric (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Security by Design (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Sunpower Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *TDH Construction, Inc., dba Foothill Painting & Drywall (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Tanner Masonry (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *WOODSIDE 05N, L.P. (Cross-Complainant); Participant: *Warda Glass, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: *Western Insulation, LP, dba Western Insulation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Candelaria Springs (Plaintiff); Participant: Debbie Nails (Plaintiff); Participant: Doe 1 Woodside Preton Meadows, Inc (Defendant); Participant: Edwina Wallace (Plaintiff); Participant: Jerry M. Juan (Plaintiff); Participant: Joe Silva (Plaintiff); Participant: Linda G. Wells (Plaintiff); Participant: Maria Leah G. Juan (Plaintiff); Participant: Santiago Reyes (Plaintiff); Participant: Sarah F Burke (Special Master); Participant: Tiffany Reyes (Plaintiff); Participant: Tsz Ho (Plaintiff); Participant: WOODSIDE 05N, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); Participant: WOODSIDE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Participant: Winnifred L. Wanzala-Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 10/27/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 12/15/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on October 27, 2020. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wallace, Edwina; Reyes, Santiago; Reyes, Tiffany; Juan, Jerry M.; Juan, Maria Leah G.; Nails, Debbie; Springs, Candelaria; Wanzala-Silva, Winnifred L.; Wells, Linda G.; Silva, Joe. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Tiffany Reyes . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Santiago Reyes . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Maria Leah G. Juan . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Jerry M. Juan . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Jerry Juan in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 397111. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Wallace, Edwina; Reyes, Santiago; Reyes, Tiffany; Juan, Jerry M.; Juan, Maria Leah G.; Nails, Debbie; Springs, Candelaria; Wanzala-Silva, Winnifred L.; Wells, Linda G.; Silva, Joe. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S Hafoka Electric is a litigant

Latest cases where RCI Electric Inc is a litigant