Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:31:35 (UTC).

Jerry Douglas Johnson vs Sean Mark Braskat et al.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 Jerry Douglas Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sean Mark Braskat. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2425

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Jerry Douglas

Defendants

Braskat, Bruce

Braskat, Sean Mark

Braskat, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bertch, Whit D

Defendant Attorney

Foster, Luke A.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jerry Douglas Johnson, Sean Mark Braskat, Bruce Braskat Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, Jerry Douglas. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Braskat, Sean Mark; Braskat, Bruce. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Braskat, Sean Mark; Braskat, Bruce. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Braskat, Sean Mark; Braskat, Bruce. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by Johnson, Jerry Douglas. DUPLICATE Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sean Mark Braskat served on 12/18/2016 by Personal Service. $93.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Jerry Douglas. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 01/22/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Braskat, Bruce; Braskat, Sean Mark. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/20/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/06/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Braskat, Bruce; Braskat, Sean Mark. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Braskat served on 12/18/2016 by Substituted Service. $53.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Bruce Braskat served on 12/20/2016 by Substituted Service. $53.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint for Personal Injury filed by Johnson, Jerry Douglas. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jerry Douglas Johnson, Sean Mark Braskat, Bruce Braskat Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Braskat, Sean Mark; Braskat, Michael. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 01/22/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on January 22, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Braskat, Bruce; Braskat, Sean Mark. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Bruce Braskat served on 12/20/2016 by Substituted Service. $53.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Sean Mark Braskat served on 12/18/2016 by Personal Service. $93.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/06/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Attorney, Whit D Bertch, retained for Jerry Douglas Johnson . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Payment received by Jerry Johnson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 125489. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Jerry Douglas. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Personal Injury filed by Johnson, Jerry Douglas. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less