This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:40:11 (UTC).

Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees vs Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation,

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Mountain Valley Express Co , Inc , A California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2044

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees

Defendant

Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larsen, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

O'Connor, Michael J Jr

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/05/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing - Civil Jury Trial

Hearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 05/06/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 04/02/2019 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Appointment of Official Reporter

Order for Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore, Vicki Jelley, CSR# 11067 filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Reply to Opposition

Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation,. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Opposition

Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc.'s Demurrer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation,. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order Granting Demurrer

Order Granting Demurrer filed by Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation,. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 10/13/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/29/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM015 Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration

Declaration of Michael J. O'Connor, Jr. in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation,. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Duplicate Proof of service of Summons filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint For: Violation of California's Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004 (CAL. LAB. Code 2698, ET SEQ.) filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation, served on 04/24/2017 by Substituted Service. $209.29 Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint for Violation of California's Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004 filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Hearing Result: JT Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Hearing Result: MSC Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees, Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation, Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • SDT received by T-Mobile USA, Inc. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 05/06/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 04/02/2019 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on April 5, 2018. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., A California Corporation, served on 04/24/2017 by Substituted Service. $209.29 Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/29/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Attorney, Neil M Larsen, retained for Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Violation of California's Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004 filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Jerry Contreras, Individually, and On Behalf of Aggrieved Employees. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Payment received by Individually, Jerry Contreras in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 147195. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSEN NEIL MICHAEL