This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 11:43:53 (UTC).

Jeri Gardner-Thompson vs Paul Stadelman, M.D. et al.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 Jeri Gardner-Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Paul Stadelman, M D. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0557

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gardner-Thompson, Jeri

Defendants

Sutter Gould Medical Foundation

Stadelman, M.D., Paul

Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a business entity, form unknown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagundes, Joseph H

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 06/29/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal for failure to appear on May 23, 2018 at Further Case Management Conference and for failure to serve; CCP 583.410, set for 06/29/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/23/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Notice of Hearing

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/20/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

03/20/2018: MinuteOrder.rtf

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

W. Stephen Scott Assigned. BATCH Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/21/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Dismissal - Other See minute order dated June 29, 2018 Entered as of 06/29/2018 Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on June 29, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 06/29/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on May 23, 2018. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/23/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal for failure to appear on May 23, 2018 at Further Case Management Conference and for failure to serve; CCP 583.410, set for 06/29/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 20, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/20/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/23/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/21/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Attorney, Joseph H Fagundes, retained for Jeri Gardner-Thompson . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gardner-Thompson, Jeri. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Payment received by Jeri Gardner-Thompson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 135572. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fagundes, Joseph H