This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/12/2019 at 09:06:44 (UTC).

Jeremias M Ripoyla vs. Pulte Home Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/04/2014 Jeremias M Ripoyla filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2092

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeremias M Ripoyla

Ripoyla, Jeremias M

Hartley, Lisa

Vargas, Maria M

Mileto, Danny

Norred, Pamela

Ngigi, Francis K

Avila, Kris G

Saffold, Juanita

Tsafack, Paul

Francisco, Virginia

Rahin, Khater

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pulte Home Corporation

Coastal Construction and Lumber Company

Merillat Corporation

Rangel Drywall, Inc.

MWB Building Contractors, Inc.

Milgard Manufacturing, Inc.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Precision Industries Solid Surface And Millworks, Inc.

J. Edwards Gish, Inc.

Coastal Construction and Lumber Company

Merillat Corporation

Rangel Drywall, Inc.

MWB Building Contractors, Inc.

Milgard Manufacturing, Inc.

93 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jackson, Lee

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Constantino, Matthew S.

Burek, Lawrence M.

Lockhart, Robert D.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Burek, Lawrence M.

Lockhart, Robert D.

Other Attorneys

Meyer, Raymond Jr.

Moak, Stacy M.

Aguilera, Eric A.

Hazelton, Troy M.

Leenarts, Eric M.

Panchal, Jitesh G.

Koper, Jacob

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America's Complaint in Intervention filed by Cassle Door & Insulation Company, Inc. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Minute Order

01/21/2015: Minute Order

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal as to JMA Investments, Ltd. dba Ahrens Landscape ONLY filed by Pulte Home Corporation. **NOT ENTERED** Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice

Notice of Change of Company Name to Villara Corporation filed by Beutler Corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 08/17/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Firm Address filed by Atlantic Concrete, Inc. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Merillat Corporation. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney filed by Mickey Wall Painting, Inc.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Payment Receipt

07/31/2015: Payment Receipt

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Cassle Door & Insulation Company NOT ENTERED filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Cassle Door & Insulation Company, Inc., Elegant Surfaces, Norman Masonry, J. Edwards Gish, Inc., Masco Cabinetry LLC, Precision Industries Solid Surface And Millworks, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, RT/DT, Inc. dba Thomas Plumbing (Deft in Intervention), In Intervention Mickey Wall Painting, Inc.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Jennifer S. Marvin as Re OSC Re: Dismissal and request to Vacate OSCfiled by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 05/29/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on April 13, 2018. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 04/13/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
852 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2014
  • Cause of Action number 3 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Cause of Action number 2 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 08/01/2014 at 08:45:00 AM in 11 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kronlund, Barbara. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Original Summons filed by Ripoyla, Jeremias M on 03/04/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ripoyla, Jeremias M on 03/04/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Complaint filed by Ripoyla, Jeremias M on 03/04/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rangel Drywall Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERILLAT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MWB Building Contractors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL CONSTRUCTION & LUMBER COMPANY is a litigant