This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 09:11:24 (UTC).

Jeremiah Sisco Asencio vs Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 Jeremiah Sisco Asencio filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Anka Behavioral Health, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2820

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco

Defendant

Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cunningham, Michael

Defendant Attorney

Werth, Steven Douglas

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jeremiah Sisco Asencio, Anka Behavioral Health, Inc. Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/20/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jeremiah Sisco Asencio, Anka Behavioral Health, Inc. Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on December 15, 2016. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/15/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on September 20, 2016. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Attorney, Steven Douglas Werth, retained for Anka Behavioral Health, Inc. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/20/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 43237. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Asencio, Jeremiah Sisco. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Attorney, Michael Cunningham, retained for Jeremiah Sisco Asencio . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less