This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 06:14:29 (UTC).

Jenny Easterling et al. vs Aaron Nabayan et al.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Jenny Easterling filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Aaron Nabayan. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3074

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Easterling, Jenny

Easterling, Daniel

Defendants

Nabayan, Aaron

Nabayan, Rey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silva, Michael Joe

Defendant Attorney

Kronlund, Michael C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Easterling, Daniel; Easterling, Jenny. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Easterling, Daniel; Easterling, Jenny. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Inclusion of Case Management Conference filed by Easterling, Jenny. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Rey Nabayan served on 04/26/2021 by Personal Service. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EGC)

05/03/2021: UNKNOWN

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Aaron Nabayan served on 05/04/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Answer

Defendant's Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Nabayan, Aaron; Nabayan, Rey. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Aaron Nabayan (Defendant); Participant: Daniel Easterling (Plaintiff); Participant: Jenny Easterling (Plaintiff); Participant: Rey Nabayan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael C Kronlund, retained for Rey Nabayan . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael C Kronlund, retained for Aaron Nabayan . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant's Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Nabayan, Aaron; Nabayan, Rey. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Rey Nabayan in the amount of $870.00. Receipt number 653040. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Aaron Nabayan served on 05/04/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketErin Guy Castillo Assigned. BATCH Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Rey Nabayan served on 04/26/2021 by Personal Service. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Daniel Easterling in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 636346. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/05/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of Case Management Conference filed by Easterling, Jenny. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Easterling, Daniel; Easterling, Jenny. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Easterling, Daniel; Easterling, Jenny. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jenny Easterling in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 636037. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael Joe Silva, retained for Daniel Easterling . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Michael Joe Silva, retained for Jenny Easterling . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kronlund, Michael C