This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 18:07:35 (UTC).

Jennifer Wilmot vs Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Jennifer Wilmot filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Jamv, Inc dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3806

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmot, Jennifer

Defendants

Aquirrles, Datra

Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobs, Elana R

Defendant Attorney

Pelochino, Joseph E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wilmot, Jennifer. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Wilmot, Jennifer. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Wilmot, Jennifer. $0.00. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation served on 05/14/2021 by Substituted Service. $183.09. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Answer

Defendant JAMV, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Damages-----First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Datra Aquirrles (Defendant); Participant: Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Jennifer Wilmot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant JAMV, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Damages-----First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Jamv in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 659275. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Joseph E Pelochino, retained for Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Wilmot, Jennifer. $0.00. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation served on 05/14/2021 by Substituted Service. $183.09. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/27/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Wilmot, Jennifer. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wilmot, Jennifer. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jennifer Wilmot in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 641156. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Elana R Jacobs, retained for Jennifer Wilmot . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELOCHINO JOSEPH EDWARD