This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 10:12:04 (UTC).

Jennifer Wilcox vs Paul M. Wilcox

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 Jennifer Wilcox filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Paul M Wilcox. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0183

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wilcox, Jennifer

Respondent

Wilcox, Paul M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Subsequent Fee Waiver Granted Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration of Mailing or of Inability to Ascertain Address filed by Wilcox, Jennifer. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Request for Default against Paul M. Wilcox Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $1.50, receipt number 174113. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Wilcox, Jennifer. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Request for Default against Paul M. Wilcox Not Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Publication filed by Wilcox, Jennifer. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Order for Publication of Summons filed by Jennifer Wilcox. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Application for Order for Publication or Posting filed by Wilcox, Jennifer. Action Type: Application for Order for Publication or Posting; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Order for Publication of Summons filed by Jennifer Wilcox. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Application for Order for Publication or Posting filed by Wilcox, Jennifer. Action Type: Application for Order for Publication or Posting; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Jennifer Wilcox. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Wilcox, Jennifer. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less