This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:45:03 (UTC).

Jennifer Mason vs Lawrence C Mason

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Jennifer Mason filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Lawrence C Mason. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0905

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mason, Jennifer

Respondent

Mason, Lawrence C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • Corrected Copy Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Corrected Copy Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Corrected Copy Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Corrected Copy Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Mason, Jennifer. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Separate Property Declaration filed by Mason, Jennifer. Action Type: Separate Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Request for Default against Lawrence C Mason Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Mason, Jennifer. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Lawrence C Mason filed. Served on 03/15/2016. Method of Service: Substituted service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 34315. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34303. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Mason, Jennifer. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less