This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:47 (UTC).

Jeff Paradiso vs Richard Roehrig et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Jeff Paradiso filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Richard Roehrig. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1893

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paradiso, Jeff

Defendants

Roehrig, Richard

Wunderlich, Kenny

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Richard Roehrig served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Richard Roehrig, Kenny Wunderlich Denied Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Jeff Paradiso against Richard Roehrig, Kenny Wunderlich filed and entered. All Occupants NOT included in the Judgment. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kenny Wunderlich served on 02/28/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 43216. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Jeff Paradiso against Richard Roehrig, Kenny Wunderlich filed and entered. All Occupants NOT included in the Judgment. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Request for Default against Richard Roehrig, Kenny Wunderlich Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Richard Roehrig, Kenny Wunderlich Denied Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Kenny Wunderlich served on 02/28/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Richard Roehrig served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 34477. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Paradiso, Jeff. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less