This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 06:19:34 (UTC).

Jason Evans vs Kimberley Evans

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Jason Evans filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kimberley Evans. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5011

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Evans, Jason

Respondent

Evans, Kimberley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ellis, Albert M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Kimberley Evans filed. Served on 11/17/2021. Method of Service: Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Response to Disso as to Kimberley Evans served on 11/17/2021 by Mailing. $0.00. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Albert M Ellis, Hakeem Ellis & Marengo retained for Jason Evans . Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Evans, Jason. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jason Evans in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 695755. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Albert M