Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:09:36 (UTC).

Jaquelyn Gomez vs Felix John Martinez

Case Summary

On 12/02/2016 Jaquelyn Gomez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Felix John Martinez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2203

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gomez, Jaquelyn

Defendant

Martinez, Felix John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swartz, Esq., Mark R.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jaquelyn Gomez, Felix John Martinez Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

dis

Request for Dismissal filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order to Show Cause

Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Terminating Sanctions filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 01/04/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on 09/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on 09/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order to Show Cause

Court's Order to Show as to Plaintiff, and Plaintiff's Counsel Cause filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear Court's OSC as to Plaintiff and Counsel for Failure to Appear, Failure to File CMC Statement, and Failure to Serve Defendant, set for 09/13/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/31/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $100.00, receipt number 297659. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Assessed $100.00 Civil Costs on Plaintiff, Gomez, Jaquelyn Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jaquelyn Gomez, Felix John Martinez Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal - Filing as to Jaquelyn Gomez Not Entered. Form Incomplete. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 01/04/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Terminating Sanctions filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on September 13, 2017. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear Court's OSC as to Plaintiff and Counsel for Failure to Appear, Failure to File CMC Statement, and Failure to Serve Defendant, set for 09/13/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 31, 2017. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/31/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/31/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gomez, Jaquelyn. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Payment received by Jaquelyn Gomez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 123995. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swartz, Esq., Mark R.