Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 15:41:54 (UTC).

Janine Smith vs Food 4 Less GM, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Janine Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Food 4 Less GM, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9225

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Janine

Defendants

Food 4 Less GM, Inc.

Food 4 Less of California, Inc.

PAQ, Inc.

Reflect Tech, Inc. (Doe 2)

Cross Plaintiff

Reflectech, Inc.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 to 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Babadjouni, Shahryar M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hart, Nancy D

Peterson, Patricia Joan

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Demand for Jury Trial

Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit filed by PAQ, Inc.. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by PAQ, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Reflect Tech, Inc. (Doe 2). Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint for Indemnity filed by Reflectech, Inc.. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Reflect Tech, Inc. (Doe 2). Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SUM110 Summons - Cross Complaint

Summons as to Cross Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by PAQ, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice to Filing Party

03/09/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena For Production Of Business Records Or, In The Alternative, For A Protective Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof; Request For Sanctions [Proposed Order] filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Compliant naming Doe 2 (REFLECT TECH, INC) filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Receiving Transferred Action

Notice of Receiving Transferred Action. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Certified Copy of Order Changing Venue

Minute Order (Motion for Change of Venue) filed by Janine Smith, PAQ, Inc.. Judge: Holly, Carter.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Food 4 Less GM, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Food 4 Less of California, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Janine Smith (Plaintiff); Participant: PAQ, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Reflect Tech, Inc. (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Patricia Joan Peterson, retained for Reflect Tech, Inc. (Doe 2) . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant's Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit filed by PAQ, Inc.. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. PAQ in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 661248. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by PAQ, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Reflect Tech, Inc. (Doe 2). Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Patricia Joan Peterson, retained for Reflectech, Inc. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons as to Cross Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint for Indemnity filed by Reflectech, Inc.. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Transmittal. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Shahryar M. Babadjouni, retained for Janine Smith . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Nancy D Hart, retained for PAQ, Inc. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion for Change of Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities;Declaration of Nancy D. Hart in Support of Motion filed by PAQ, Inc.. Action Type: Motion (No Fee); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smith, Janine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Janine Smith in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 596582. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS GM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Paq, Inc. dba Food 4 Less and/or Rancho San Miguel Markets, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON, PATRICIA J