This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:33:17 (UTC).

Janet Briscoe et al. vs Pulte Home Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 Janet Briscoe filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, W. Stephen and Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9679

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, W. Stephen

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Briscoe, Janet

Concha, Aileen

Salas, Leo

Hardy, Barbara

Gardner, Richard

Torres, Andrew

Hardy, Edward

Salas, Selina

Ross, Carl

Lugo, Elizabeth

Carl, Sharon

Colburn, Cindy Cabero

Lugo, Louis

Lee, John

Torres, Armandina

Luna, Gilbert

Lee, Nu

Cruz, Jose F

Defendants

Pulte Home Corporation

Pulte Home Corporation, a Michigan Corporation

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jackson, Lee

Defendant Attorney

Constantino, Matthew S.

Other Attorneys

Greenan, Philip M

McElroy, Julie D.

Boruszewski, Kelly T.

Bromgard, Todd D

Taylor, Brian L.

Marchiano, David M

Nakagawa, Edwin S.

Welch, Stephen B.

 

Court Documents

Application for Recommendation and Order for Service of Summons on California Secretary of State as to Central Valley Carpentry, Inc. CCP 416.10

Declaration of Laura J. Loeck, Esq. in Support of Application for Recommendation and Order for Service of Summons on California Secretary of State as to Central Valley Carpentry, Inc. CCP 416.10 filed by Pulte Home Corporation, a Michigan Corporation; Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer to Cross-Complaint filed by Budget Drywall Co.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Pulte Home Corporation, a Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Application for Recommendation and Order for Service of summons on CA Secretary of State as to CRDF Vaca Valley Roofing, Inc. dba Old Country Roofing

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Application for Recommendation and Order for Service of summons on CA Secretary of State as to CRDF Vaca Valley Roofing, Inc. dba Old Country Roofing filed by Pulte Home Corporation, a Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Beutler Corporation nka Villara Corporation served on 10/19/2017 by Substituted Service. $98.65. Costs Cross Complaint Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer to Cross-Complaint filed by Western Sun Enterprises, Inc. dba Three D Electric Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer to Cross-Complaintfiled by Cantrell Construction, Inc. dba Quality Door & Trim. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer to Cross-Complaint filed by American Engineering Contractors, Inc. dba Budget Electric. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

219 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Contractors Insurance Company of North America on behalf of its insured, Davis & Davis, Inc. dba State Roofing, a suspended corporation Entered. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal filed by INTV Contractors Insurance Company of North America on behalf of its insured, Davis & Davis, Inc. dba State Roofing, a suspended corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Pulte Home Corporation, a Michigan Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant (Cross-Complaint) entered as to Pulte Home Company, LLC, Air Design, Inc., Atlantic Concrete, Inc., American Engineering Contractors, Inc. dba Budget Electric, Beutler Corporation nka Villara Corporation, Budget Drywall Co., Builder Services Group, Inc., BZ Plumbing Company, Inc., Cantrell Construction, Inc. dba Quality Door & Trim, Capital City Drywall, Inc., Coastal Construction & Lumber Company, Creative Design Interiors, Inc., Elegant Surfaces, Davis & Davis, Inc. dba State Roofing, Inc., Double R Drywall, Fenceworks, Inc. dba Golden State Fence Company, G.E. Appliances, Grover/Gonzalez, Inc., Hearth & Home Technologies, Inc. dba Fireside Hearth & Home, Jerry Dellinger Concrete, Inc., Kenyon Plastering, Inc., Larry Methvin Installations, Inc. dba LMI, L & P Landscaping, Inc. dba Imperial Landscape, Inc., Mercury Performance Plumbing, Inc., Merillat Corporation nka Masco Corporation, Mid Valley Plastering, Inc., Mid Valley Painting, Inc., Milgard Manufacturing Incorporated, Olympic Millwork, Inc. dba Doorway Manufacturing Company, OCR Solar & Roofing, Inc., Pacheco Tractor Service, Inc., Sacramento Insulation Contractors dba Sacramento Building Products, The Design Studio, Inc. dba Builder Design Studios, Inc., Western Sun Enterprises, Inc. dba Three D Electric Company, Vaca Valley Roofing, Inc. dba Old Country Roofing, Western Insulation, LP, JMA Investments, Ltd. dba Ahrens Landscape, AlCal Specialty Contracting, Inc. fka AlCal/Arcade Contracting, Inc., Barbosa Cabinets, Inc., Central Valley Carpentry, Inc., Norman Masonry, Inc., Douglas Lynn Boone dba Vintage Garage Door Company, CA Holdings Inc. dba WBC Lighting, Western Shower Door, Inc., J. Edward Gish, Inc. dba Woodland Stairs & Millwork, Western Shower Door, Inc.. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Cross-Complaint) filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2019
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant (Complaint) entered as to Janet Briscoe, Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Home Corporation, a Michigan Corporation, Cindy Cabero Colburn, Dino Concha, Aileen Concha, Jose F Cruz, Richard Gardner, Edward Hardy, Barbara Hardy, John Lee, Nu Lee, Louis Lugo, Louis Lugo, Elizabeth Lugo, Gilbert Luna, Deanna Luna, Carl Ross, Sharon Carl, Sharon Ross, Leo Salas, Selina Salas, Andrew Torres, Armandina Torres. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Complaint) filed by Briscoe, Janet. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
371 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Attorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Jose F Cruz . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Attorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Aileen Concha . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Attorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Dino Concha . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Attorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Cindy Cabero Colburn . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Payment received by Janet Briscoe in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 209466. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Briscoe, Janet. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Payment received by Janet Briscoe in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 209466. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Briscoe, Janet. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Briscoe, Janet. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly T Boruszewski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR BRIAN L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAKAGAWA, EDWIN S.