This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:44:34 (UTC).

Janai Robinson vs Taren Ashley Borreno-Zolliecoffer

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Janai Robinson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Taren Ashley Borreno-Zolliecoffer. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1878

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robinson, Janai

Defendant

Borrero-Zolliecoffer, Taren Ashley

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Janai Robinson filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court $1,500 or less filed by Robinson, Janai. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court $1,500 or less; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service as to Taren Ashley Borreno-Zolliecoffer (Substituted service). No Fee Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 28, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/28/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Taren Ashley Borreno-Zolliecoffer (Substituted service). No Fee Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Janai Robinson filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/28/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Principal 664.00, Costs 30.00 (FW) Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court $1,500 or less filed by Robinson, Janai. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court $1,500 or less; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less