This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/14/2020 at 06:36:01 (UTC).

James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC. vs Melvin Lesley

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against Melvin Lesley. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fattarsi, Jonathan W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0661

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC.,

Respondent

Lesley, Melvin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dahlberg, John N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of service filed by James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC.,. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of service filed by James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC.,. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of service filed by James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC.,. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Jonathan W. Fattarsi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOrder signed and filed in open court. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCourt Finding filed. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on 10/01/2019 11:00 AM . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketHearing re: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on October 1, 2019. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Jonathan W. Fattarsi; Participant: James Luccehesi/Safeway, INC. (Petitioner); Participant: Melvin Lesley (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order , set for 10/01/2019 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Fattarsi in Department M2. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail as to response to Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order- Civil filed by Lesley, Melvin. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders filed by Lesley, Melvin. Action Type: Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order Work Place Violence, set for 09/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Fattarsi in Department M2. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 08/16/2019. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - Workplace Violence filed by Safeway, INC. James Lucchesi. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence) filed by Lucchesi, James. Action Type: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lucchesi, James. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketAttorney, John N. Dahlberg, retained for Safeway, INC/James Lucchesi . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.