This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:41:58 (UTC).

James F Wilson vs Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 James F Wilson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1853

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilson, James F

Defendant

Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mcgee, William Robert

Defendant Attorney

Steinberg, Michael H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

02/23/2016: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Removal

Notice to the Superior COurt and Adverse Parties of Fiing of Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court by Defendant Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) filed by Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc. served on 02/26/2016. Type of Service Personal. $65.95. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to James F Wilson, Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc. Entered. With Prejudice Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to James F Wilson, Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc. Entered. With Prejudice Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Case status updated to All Proceedings Stayed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to the Superior COurt and Adverse Parties of Fiing of Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court by Defendant Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) filed by Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Attorney, Michael H Steinberg, retained for Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc. . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $1.50, receipt number 35399. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc. served on 02/26/2016. Type of Service Personal. $65.95. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/19/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34094. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wilson, James F. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, William Robert Mcgee, retained for James F Wilson . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less