This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 06:04:51 (UTC).

Jaime Garcia Ahumada vs Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Jaime Garcia Ahumada filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc , a Delaware Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5410

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia Ahumada, Jaime

Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ungs, Lauren A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Garcia Ahumada, Jaime.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Garcia Ahumada, Jaime.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia Ahumada, Jaime.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation served on 06/30/2022 by Personal Service. $30.00.

Answer

Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Jaime Garcia Ahumada (Plaintiff); Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Inc., Nissan North America in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 759254.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation served on 06/30/2022 by Personal Service. $30.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/03/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Garcia Ahumada, Jaime.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Garcia Ahumada, Jaime.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Ungs, retained for Jaime Garcia Ahumada .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia Ahumada, Jaime.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Jaime Garcia Ahumada in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 750705.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer UNGS LAUREN A.