This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 06:23:19 (UTC).

Jackie Thompson vs Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 Jackie Thompson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1658

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant

Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melmed, Jonathan

Defendant Attorney

Long, Christine H.

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/02/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Case Management Conference Statement filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer filed by Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amended Affidavit of Due Diligence

Amended Affidavit of Due Diligence filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Affidavit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amended Proof of Service Summons

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company served on 12/01/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/02/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/26/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 2, 2018. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Case Management Conference Statement filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Attorney, Christine H. Long, retained for Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Complex Case Fee (Per Defendant) filed by Cheema Freightlines, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (Per Defendant); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Payment received by a Cheema Freightlines in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 250290. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Payment received by a Cheema Freightlines in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 250290. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • Attorney, Jonathan Melmed, retained for Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/02/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Payment received by individually Jackie Thompson in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 228550. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackie Thompson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Payment received by individually Jackie Thompson in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 228550. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheema Freightlines, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELMED, JONATHAN