This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:44:21 (UTC).

Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust vs Rupinder Kaur et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Rupinder Kaur. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1875

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust

Defendants

Kaur, Rupinder

Gong, Wayne Andy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chan, Clarence K

Defendant Attorney

Sekhon, Simran

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Wayne Andy Gong Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration of Clarence K. Chan in Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Wayne Andy Gong served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Motion and motion to vacate default

Notice of Motion and motion to vacate default; First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Kaur, Rupinder. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Rupinder Kaur Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendant's motion to vacate default judgment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendant's motion to vacate default judgment filed by Kaur, Rupinder. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order After Hearing

Court Order Denying DEFTS motion to vacate default After Hearing filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of service of motion and supporting documents

Proof of service of motion and supporting documents filed by Kaur, Rupinder. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Rupinder Kaur served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust against Rupinder Kaur filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Rupinder Kaur served on 03/18/2016 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $125.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Points and Authorities

Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Rupinder Kaur filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Order Denying DEFTS motion to vacate default After Hearing filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment held on 08/09/2016 03:38 PM . Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Hearing re: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment held on August 9, 2016. Judge: Demetras, Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Clarence K. Chan in Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Rupinder Kaur filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment DEFT Rupinder Kaur's motion to vacate default and judgment, set for 08/09/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Kaur, Rupinder. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of motion and supporting documents filed by Kaur, Rupinder. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Simran Sekhon in Support of Defendant's motion to vacate default judgment filed by Kaur, Rupinder. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Rupinder Kaur Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Wayne Andy Gong served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Rupinder Kaur served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34203. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Clarence K Chan, retained for Jack Gong, trustee of the Jack and Anna Gong 2007 Family Trust . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less