This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:28:40 (UTC).

J. Jesus Del Villar vs Ma Esther Sanchez

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 J Jesus Del Villar filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ma Esther Sanchez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0850

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Del Villar, J. Jesus

Respondent

Sanchez, Ma Esther

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $15.00, receipt number 254223. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Order After Hearing filed by J. Jesus Del Villar, Ma Esther Sanchez. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on February 21, 2017. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/21/2017 08:15 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Request for Interpreter (Civil) filed by Sanchez, Ma Esther. Action Type: Request for Interpreter (Civil); Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial RE: Spousal Support, set for 02/21/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department F1. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on January 3, 2017. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 01/03/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2016
  • Response Domestic Partnership/Marriage filed by Sanchez, Ma Esther. Action Type: Response Domestic Partnership/Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 41849. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Proof of service filed by Sanchez, Ma Esther. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Ma Esther Sanchez . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ma Esther Sanchez filed. Served on 03/03/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to J. Jesus Del Villar filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Del Villar, J. Jesus. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Del Villar, J. Jesus. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less