This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 07:18:52 (UTC).

Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC vs Dennis Pine et al.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Dennis Pine. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3233

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC

Defendants

Pine, Brenda

Pine, Dennis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tsai, Judy C.

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UD101 Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations - Unlawful Detainer

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brenda Pine served on 05/05/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dennis Pine served on 05/05/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UD120 Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance

Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Dennis Pine, Brenda Pine Entered ONLY. - NOT entered as to All Occupants. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Dennis Pine, Brenda Pine Entered ONLY. - NOT entered as to All Occupants. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Brenda Pine, Dennis Pine Not Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC against Dennis Pine, Brenda Pine filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC against Dennis Pine, Brenda Pine filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerk Default Judgment filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Brenda Pine, Dennis Pine Not Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Dennis Pine, Brenda Pine Entered ONLY. - NOT entered as to All Occupants. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Brenda Pine served on 05/05/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dennis Pine served on 05/05/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Hearing Officer,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Islander Mobile Home Park in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 637409. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Judy C. Tsai, retained for Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TSAI, JUDY CHI-DEE