This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 13:03:07 (UTC).

Isai Magallanes Cosio vs Martin David Robinson

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Isai Magallanes Cosio filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Martin David Robinson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0141

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cosio, Isai Magallanes

Defendant

Robinson, Martin David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swanson, Benjamin D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Martin David Robinson served on 02/11/2023 by Personal Service. $331.50.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Robinson, Martin David.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Robinson, Martin David.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Isai Magallanes Cosio (Plaintiff); Martin David Robinson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Martin Robinson in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 822710.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Robinson, Martin David.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Robinson, Martin David.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Martin Robinson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 822114.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Martin David Robinson served on 02/11/2023 by Personal Service. $331.50.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Isai Cosio in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 802306.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Benjamin D. Swanson, retained for Isai Magallanes Cosio .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less