*******************0141
01/09/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
San Joaquin, California
Lee, Jayne
Cosio, Isai Magallanes
Robinson, Martin David
Swanson, Benjamin D.
Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.
Summons issued and filed.
Proof of Service of Summons as to Martin David Robinson served on 02/11/2023 by Personal Service. $331.50.
First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Robinson, Martin David.
Demand for Jury Trial filed by Robinson, Martin David.
Case Management Statement filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.
Case Management Statement filed by Robinson, Martin David.
Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/07/2023 08:30 AM .
HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee
[-] Read LessDocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 07/22/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 07/01/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee
[-] Read LessDocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/07/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 7, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement filed by Robinson, Martin David.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketPayment received by Isai Cosio in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 844025.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketPayment received by Martin Robinson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 822114.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service of Summons as to Martin David Robinson served on 02/11/2023 by Personal Service. $331.50.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cosio, Isai Magallanes.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketPayment received by Isai Cosio in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 802306.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketAttorney, Benjamin D. Swanson, retained for Isai Magallanes Cosio .; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read LessDocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne
[-] Read Less