This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 21:27:55 (UTC).

Isabel Chavez vs Scott Johnson

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Isabel Chavez filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Scott Johnson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0930

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chavez, Isabel

Defendant

Johnson, Scott

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Scott Johnson, All Other Occupants Entered

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

AMENDED~ Proof of Service of Summons as to Scott Johnson served on 03/16/2022 by Substituted Service. $30.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to Scott Johnson filed by Chavez, Isabel. Invalid

Writ Return

Writ of Possession returned Unserved as to Scott Johnson. Costs $80.00

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Isabel Chavez against Scott Johnson filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. .

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

~AMENDED~ Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 03/16/2022. $30.00.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of service as to all other occupants filed by Chavez, Isabel. Invalid

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Scott Johnson, All Other Occupants Not Entered. POS invalid

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Chavez, Isabel.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession returned Unserved as to Scott Johnson. Costs $80.00; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Scott Johnson on 05/19/2022 to San Joaquin County.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Action One Property Management Inc. in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 739669.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Isabel Chavez against Scott Johnson filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Scott Johnson, All Other Occupants Entered; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Chavez, Isabel.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED~ Proof of Service of Summons as to Scott Johnson served on 03/16/2022 by Substituted Service. $30.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~AMENDED~ Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 03/16/2022. $30.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Scott Johnson, All Other Occupants Not Entered. POS invalid; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Chavez, Isabel.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Chavez, Isabel.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Chavez, Isabel.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Action One Property Management Inc. in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 715061.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Isabel Chavez .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chavez, Isabel.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less