This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:44:45 (UTC).

Insurance Company of the West vs Crystal Ruth Huffman

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Insurance Company of the West filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Crystal Ruth Huffman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1880

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Insurance Company of the West

Defendant

Huffman, Crystal Ruth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linsao, Miljoy B.

Defendant Attorney

Kronlund, Michael C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Huffman, Crystal Ruth. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Huffman, Crystal Ruth. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS015 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil

Proof of Service of Summons as to Crystal Ruth Huffman served on 03/24/2016. Type of Service Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order filed by Superior Court. Order on Notice of Related Case CV-2016-1868 Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Statement of Damages; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice to Filing Party

04/05/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order entered and filed. Stipulation to Consolidate Actions and Order Thereon Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice to Filing Party

04/06/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Order

04/08/2016: Order

Notice of Pending Action

Notice of Pending Action pursuant to Labor Code 3853 filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM015 Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Huffman, Crystal Ruth. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Case consolidated with case: , STK-CV-UAT-2016-0001868 Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order entered and filed. Stipulation to Consolidate Actions and Order Thereon Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order filed by Huffman, Crystal Ruth. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed by Superior Court. Order on Notice of Related Case CV-2016-1868 Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/19/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pending Action pursuant to Labor Code 3853 filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/23/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Damages filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Statement of Damages; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34272. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Insurance Company of the West. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Miljoy B. Linsao, retained for Insurance Company of the West . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less