Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 07:59:02 (UTC).

In the Matter of Wagio Collins

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 In the Matter of Wagio Collins was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1063

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Waigi, Isabelle

Minor

Collins, Wagio

Interested Parties

Stockton Covenant Church, Inc.

Marston, Keith Dougals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Zabetian, Arash H.

Interested Party Attorneys

Randolph, Jane E

Bernhardt, Victoria R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor; Court Room: 11A; Result: Held; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys; Participant: Isabelle Waigi (Petitioner); Participant: Keith Dougals Marston (Interested Party); Participant: Stockton Covenant Church, Inc. (Interested Party); Participant: Wagio Collins (Minor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on March 15, 2021. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on 03/15/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of teleconference appearance filed by Marston, Keith Dougals. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor; Court Room: 11A; Result: Held; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys; Participant: Isabelle Waigi (Petitioner); Participant: Keith Dougals Marston (Interested Party); Participant: Stockton Covenant Church, Inc. (Interested Party); Participant: Wagio Collins (Minor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor , set for 03/15/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on February 8, 2021. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on 02/08/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration of Arash H Zabetian Clarifying Issues Identified by the Court in its Ruling of December 21, 2020 filed by Collins, Wagio. Action Type: Supplemental Declaration - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration filed by Waigi, Isabelle. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Victoria R Bernhardt, retained for Keith Dougals Marston . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Joint Objection to Petitioner Isabelle Waigi's Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for a Person With Disabilities filed by Stockton Covenant Church, Inc.; Marston, Keith Dougals. Action Type: Objection; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Teleconference Appearance and Requirements filed by Waigi, Isabelle. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of teleconference appearance filed by Waigi, Isabelle. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor , set for 12/21/2020 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult (No Fee) MC-350 filed by Waigi, Isabelle. Action Type: Petition to Approve Compromise Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult (No Fee) MC-350; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Arash H. Zabetian, retained for Isabelle Waigi . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANDOLPH JANE E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernhardt, Victoria R