This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/18/2018 at 07:45:29 (UTC).

In the Matter of Vivian Mae Hight

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 In the Matter of Vivian Mae Hight was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holland, Lesley D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0179

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holland, Lesley D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moncrief, Thais

Decedent

Hight, Vivian Mae

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

McDaniel, Daniel Allen

 

Court Documents

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Thais Moncrief filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE315 Order Determining Succession to Real Property (Estates Of $150,000 or Less)

Order to Determine Succession to Real Property filed by Thais Moncrief. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Succession to Real Property held on 05/02/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed Order

04/29/2016: Proposed Order

Proposed Order

04/29/2016: Proposed Order

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing held on 04/06/2016 03:34 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

04/04/2016: TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Thais Moncrief. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE120 Notice of Hearing Decedents Estate or Trust (Probate Decedents Estates)

Notice of Hearing filed by Moncrief, Thais. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE310 Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property (Estates of $150,000 or Less)

Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property (Estates of $150,000 or less) filed by Moncrief, Thais. Action Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property DE-310; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Succession to Real Property held on 05/02/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Hearing re: Succession to Real Property held on May 2, 2016. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Determine Succession to Real Property filed by Thais Moncrief. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing held on 04/06/2016 03:34 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Thais Moncrief filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Hearing re: Fee Waiver Hearing held on April 6, 2016. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Thais Moncrief. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Fee Waiver Hearing , set for 04/06/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Moncrief, Thais. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Succession to Real Property , set for 05/02/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Moncrief, Thais. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property (Estates of $150,000 or less) filed by Moncrief, Thais. Action Type: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property DE-310; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Daniel Allen McDaniel, retained for Thais Moncrief . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less