This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 18:00:56 (UTC).

In the Matter of Shanice Taylor

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 In the Matter of Shanice Taylor was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0213

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Taylor, Cortez

Minor

Taylor, Shanice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vaysberg, Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Receipt of MC-356; Court Room: 11A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Carter Holly; Participants; Cortez Taylor (Petitioner); Shanice Taylor (Minor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account MC-356 filed by Taylor, Cortez.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $166.00, receipt number 747282.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service by Mail.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 04/27/2022 10:59 AM .; Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Receipt of MC-356 , set for 07/25/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 11A.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money into Blocked Account filed by Cortez Taylor.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor or Pending Action filed by Cortez Taylor.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCarter Holly Assigned. BATCH; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult MC-350EX filed by Taylor, Cortez.; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Allen Vaysberg, retained for Cortez Taylor .; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Allen Vaysberg in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 718227.; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAYSBERG ALLEN PAUL