This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/01/2019 at 10:35:55 (UTC).

In the Matter of Harold A. Kundert

Case Summary

On 05/19/2011 In the Matter of Harold A Kundert was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0273

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kundert, Mayvis M

Other

Cassell, Roger

Not Classified By Court

Kundert, Harold A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rosa, Randall W

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

06/16/2011: Payment Receipt

DE120 Notice of Hearing Decedents Estate or Trust (Probate Decedents Estates)

05/19/2011: DE120 Notice of Hearing Decedents Estate or Trust (Probate Decedents Estates)

Tentative Rulings

06/21/2011: Tentative Rulings

DE122 Citation Probate (Probate Decedents Estates and Guardianships and Conservatorships)

06/01/2011: DE122 Citation Probate (Probate Decedents Estates and Guardianships and Conservatorships)

Petition

05/19/2011: Petition

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

06/08/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Ex Parte Declaration and Order of Reimbursement for Investigations

06/10/2011: Ex Parte Declaration and Order of Reimbursement for Investigations

Payment Receipt

06/28/2011: Payment Receipt

Confidential Investigator's Report to Court

06/02/2011: Confidential Investigator's Report to Court

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side), 141J - Certifying a copy, paper or record in the amount of 27.00 on 06/28/2011, transaction number 817453 and receipt number 219314. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketDisposition for Kundert Mayvis M,Kundert Harold A on Petition - Other (case initiation) updated to Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Almendarez, Cecilia to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketPetition - Other (case initiation) associated on 06/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketAssociation created between Rosa', Randall W and Kundert, Mayvis M. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketCase closed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketPetition - Other (case initiation) has been Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketOrder - Other filed by Kundert, Mayvis M on 06/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketPetition - Other (case initiation) associated on 05/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketAssociation created between Rosa', Randall W and Kundert, Mayvis M. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCassell, Roger assigned as Probate Investigator Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed by Kundert, Mayvis M on 05/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (06.22.11 and proof of service) filed by Kundert, Mayvis M on 05/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Kundert, Mayvis M on 05/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCitation issued on 05/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketPetition - Other (case initiation) (Petition for order authorizing proposed transactions involving real and personal property) filed by Kundert, Mayvis M on 05/19/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosa, Randall W