This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 09:53:41 (UTC).

In the Matter of Dallas Cain Sulamo

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 In the Matter of Dallas Cain Sulamo was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0291

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Galvin-Sulamo, Careli

Interested Party

Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance

Minor

Sulamo, Dallas Cain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Rueger, Barbara J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Receipt of MC-356; Court Room: 11A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys; Participant: Careli Galvin-Sulamo (Petitioner); Participant: Dallas Cain Sulamo (Minor); Participant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account MC-356 filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. Action Type: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account MC-356; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Receipt of MC-356; Court Room: 11A; Result: Held; Judge: Sabrina Schneweis-Coe; Participant: Careli Galvin-Sulamo (Petitioner); Participant: Dallas Cain Sulamo (Minor); Participant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Receipt of MC-356 , set for 11/22/2021 at 9:15 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Receipt of MC-356 held on September 20, 2021. Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Receipt of MC-356 held on 09/20/2021 09:30 AM . Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment filed by Careli Galvin-Sulamo, Dallas Cain Sulamo, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on May 24, 2021. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on 05/24/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor , set for 05/24/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult MC-350 filed by Sulamo, Dallas Cain; Galvin-Sulamo, Careli. Action Type: Petition to Approve Compromise Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult MC-350; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Barbara J. Rueger, retained for Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Barbara Rueger in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 628845. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUEGER, BARBARA J