This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/12/2020 at 01:17:37 (UTC).

In the Matter of Athina Basilio

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 In the Matter of Athina Basilio was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0876

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Basilio, Guadalupe

Minor

Basilio, Athina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Fagundes, Joseph H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Receipt of MC-356; Court Room: 11A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys; Participant: Athina Basilio (Minor); Participant: Guadalupe Basilio (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account MC-356 filed by Basilio, Guadalupe. Action Type: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account MC-356; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Receipt of MC-356; Court Room: 11A; Result: Held; Judge: Sabrina Schneweis-Coe; Participant: Athina Basilio (Minor); Participant: Guadalupe Basilio (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Receipt of MC-356 , set for 02/24/2020 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAmended Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account filed by Guadalupe Basilio, Athina Basilio. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAmended Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment filed by Guadalupe Basilio, Athina Basilio. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Receipt of MC-356 held on December 30, 2019. Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Receipt of MC-356 held on 12/30/2019 09:00 AM . Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Schneweis-Coe, Sabrina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProbate Note published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor , set for 11/18/2019 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor; Court Room: 11A; Result: Held; Judge: Elizabeth Humphreys; Participant: Athina Basilio (Minor); Participant: Guadalupe Basilio (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on September 23, 2019. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor held on 09/23/2019 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition filed by Basilio, Guadalupe. Action Type: Amended Petition; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor , set for 09/23/2019 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 11A. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Joseph H Fagundes, retained for Guadalupe Basilio . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult (No Fee) MC-350 filed by Basilio, Guadalupe. Action Type: Petition to Approve Compromise Disputed Claim, Compromise of Pending Action, Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment of a Minor or Disabled Adult (No Fee) MC-350; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fagundes, Joseph H