This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/01/2023 at 03:15:57 (UTC).

Ignacio Gallegos vs S & S Auto Sales, Inc. DBA 303 Motors. a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 Ignacio Gallegos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against S S Auto Sales, Inc DBA 303 Motors a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1280

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gallegos, Ignacio

Defendants

Great American Insurance Company

S & S Auto Sales, Inc. DBA 303 Motors. a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gallegos, Ignacio.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Gallegos, Ignacio.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Great American Insurance Company served on 12/16/2022 by Personal Service. $80.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to S & S Auto Sales, Inc. DBA 303 Motors. a California Corporation served on 12/22/2022 by Substituted Service. $105.50.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Great American Insurance Company (Defendant); Ignacio Gallegos (Plaintiff); S & S Auto Sales, Inc. DBA 303 Motors. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Great American Insurance Company served on 12/16/2022 by Personal Service. $80.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to S & S Auto Sales, Inc. DBA 303 Motors. a California Corporation served on 12/22/2022 by Substituted Service. $105.50.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/06/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Gallegos, Ignacio.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gallegos, Ignacio.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Ignacio Gallegos in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 794087.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Kasra Sadr, retained for Ignacio Gallegos .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less